ST CLARES PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1147761
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £290.91k £270.44k £489.59k £372.94k £402.68k
Total expenditure £276.55k £265.75k £285.42k £328.14k £372.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £246.12k £227.52k N/A N/A N/A