Trustees CTU COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1148689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIMON PITKEATHLEY Trustee 25 October 2019
CAMDEN GIVING
Received: On time
Richard John Terry Trustee 21 November 2018
CAMDEN HIGHLINE
Received: On time
William Alexander Fulford Trustee 31 August 2018
None on record
Martin Sagar Trustee 22 April 2017
None on record
DEBORAH LYNN THOMAS Trustee 19 June 2013
CAMDEN HIGHLINE
Received: On time
SEWARD CAROLINE Trustee 10 July 2012
None on record