BEPOSITIVE AMIGOS

Charity number: 1149225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 April 2021 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 October 2019 258 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 October 2019 617 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 October 2019 982 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required