RUSTINGTON PARISH CHURCH HUMPHREY BEQUEST

Charity number: 1148284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £71.22k £56.35k £49.73k £50.99k £69.59k
Total expenditure £265.89k £55.77k £7.38k £8.31k £7.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A