THE JANE PACKER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1150663
Charity reporting is overdue by 156 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 156 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 156 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 25 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 25 February 2020 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 06 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 29 April 2017 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 April 2017 60 days late Download