Financial history PRABASHI

Charity number: 1148232
Charity reporting is overdue by 395 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £27.66k £33.20k £22.74k £24.36k £12.78k
Total expenditure £26.63k £32.76k £25.63k £23.60k £5.76k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A