Accounts and annual returns SAINT PETERS SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1147884
Charity reporting is overdue by 582 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 217 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 217 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 582 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 582 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 January 2020 202 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required