WYTHENSHAWE KENPO JU-JITSU ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1148946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £24.92k £22.13k £22.25k £29.57k £38.23k
Total expenditure £22.20k £21.90k £23.20k £23.28k £24.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k