BIG PICTURE CHARITY FILMS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Big Picture are a UK based Registered Charity working exclusively to help existing charities and voluntary organisations raise awareness of their causes. A visual presence through film is now a vital way for charities to communicate with both existing and potential supporters and clients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 August 2012: Standard registration
- 19 July 2023: Funds received from 1119548 FRESH START FILMS
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM ABBOTT | Chair | 01 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Simon Cooper | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas Gentry | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Rassell | Trustee | 01 July 2012 |
|
|||||
PETER ROBIN HASSARD | Trustee | 01 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.90k | £13.96k | £53.36k | £66.91k | £52.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.60k | £32.84k | £41.31k | £53.27k | £58.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04/08/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PRODUCTION OF FILMS WHICH PROMOTE VOLUNTEERING AND THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR. ‘THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR’ MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
100 ERNEST ROAD
WIVENHOE
COLCHESTER
CO7 9LJ
- Phone:
- 01206824549
- Website:
-
bigpicturecharityfilms.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window