CHARITY FOR KIDS

Charity number: 1148516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £79.82k £81.26k £57.82k £63.65k £34.37k
Total expenditure £67.82k £95.76k £67.30k £52.28k £37.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A