Financial history THE MARY HOLT TRUST

Charity number: 502978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.26k £1.30k £1.35k £1.10k £1.09k
Total expenditure £1.00k £1.30k £1.30k £1.00k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A