AGE CONCERN ORPINGTON & DISTRICT

Charity number: 1148958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
AMANDA JANE CUSTIS Trustee 11 October 2017 None on record
CATHERINE BENTLEY Chair 24 September 2014 None on record
KEITH EVANS Trustee 11 October 2017 None on record
DAVID LEONARD LEAL Trustee 11 October 2017 None on record
Kerry Jane Murray Trustee 02 September 2021 None on record
LEE PRICE Trustee 13 December 2018 None on record
DENNIS MOORE Trustee 01 March 1992 None on record