Trustees ANGLIA RUSKIN STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1148574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arya Shaji | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Muneeb Iqbal | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neelima Muraleedharan Menon | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adora Siqueira | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ASHLEY COREY | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIAN MYERS | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WATSON | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
NITHIN-RAJ GOVINDAN KRISHNAN | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Jordan | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Halderthay | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.