Accounts and annual returns ABERYSTWYTH UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1150576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 04 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 27 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 20 May 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 03 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 26 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 26 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window