Financial history ABERYSTWYTH UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1150576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £1.82m £1.27m £1.32m £1.25m £1.07m
Total expenditure £1.38m £1.17m £1.31m £1.17m £972.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £871.84k £911.57k £1.00m £990.81k £998.08k
Income - Other trading activities £103.47k £23.35k £26.57k £35.80k £11.11k
Income - Charitable activities £348.04k £333.20k £295.96k £225.53k £57.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £517 £349 £1.74k £1.35k £48
Income - Other £499.53k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £148.04k £148.62k £0 £0 £172.78k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.21m £1.16m £1.31m £1.17m £972.82k
Expenditure - Raising funds £168.98k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £6.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £3.86k £17.74k £0 £0 £0