Financial history THE CENTRE FOR ENTERPRISE, MARKETS AND ETHICS

Charity number: 1148345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £225.49k £235.71k £225.25k £354.05k £436.24k
Total expenditure £219.40k £217.27k £223.27k £352.76k £275.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A