Accounts and annual returns MONTAGU & NORTH FENHAM FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1148203
Charity reporting is overdue by 396 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Overdue by 396 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Overdue by 396 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 18 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 18 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 07 June 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 07 June 2021 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 03 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window