Financial history OPERATION IMPREZZA

Charity number: 1148240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £76.15k £70.54k £48.15k £36.48k £60.40k
Total expenditure £74.92k £68.47k £45.72k £42.53k £44.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A