Trustees OPERATION IMPREZZA

Charity number: 1148240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER HULME Chair 18 July 2012
None on record
Nicola Michelle Burgess Trustee 02 August 2021
None on record
Benjamin Charles Bailey Trustee 01 December 2020
None on record
Bhumika Sinha Trustee 10 November 2020
None on record
Michael Anthony Trustee 09 July 2018
None on record
David Jeremy Dupont Trustee 22 February 2016
None on record
Alison Jane Revell Trustee 05 January 2014
None on record
ROBERT CROSS Trustee 30 December 2012
None on record