Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY FOOTBALL ACADEMY (CFA)

Charity number: 1149497
Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 50 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 50 days
Annual return 01 April 2021 18 February 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 24 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required