MESSIANIC TESTIMONY

Charity number: 1148986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 10 August 2017 On time Download