MESSIANIC TESTIMONY

Charity number: 1148986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £595.36k £344.95k £215.55k £206.36k £316.93k
Total expenditure £296.95k £324.38k £345.04k £360.85k £330.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £573.97k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £1.38k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £20.01k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £345.08k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £293.10k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.85k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.45k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A