MESSIANIC TESTIMONY

Charity number: 1148986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Matthew Williams Trustee 14 October 2019
BETHESDA SHALOM Received: On time
John Lewis Hayward Trustee 23 November 2018 None on record
John Colin Leyshon Chair 06 August 2012
KESWICK IN WALES CONVENTION Recently registered
GORDON ROAD EVANGELICAL CHURCH Received: On time
Christina Louise Rodgers Trustee 13 November 2020
COURT FARM EVANGELICAL CHURCH Recently registered
MICHAEL JONATHAN ROBERTS Trustee 06 August 2012 None on record
Helen Kate Williams Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record