HOME-START NORTH WEST KENT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start offers support, friendship and practical assistance to families with at least one child under the age of five. Unpaid volunteers visit families struggling under the pressure of bringing up small children, helping them to avoid crisis and enjoy family life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 25 July 2012: Standard registration
- 02 August 2012: Funds received from 803190 HOME-START NORTH WEST KENT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trish Burleigh | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Frondigoun | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wonyo Setufe | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Graham | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Haines | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Funge | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Holt | Trustee | 02 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JONATHON HAWKES | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.67k | £130.78k | £142.22k | £125.11k | £124.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.74k | £112.30k | £126.81k | £130.33k | £129.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JUN 2012
Charitable objects
(A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; (B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; (D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 TEMPLE HILL SQUARE
DARTFORD
DA1 5HZ
- Phone:
- 01322 225100
- Website:
-
homestartnwkent.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window