Accounts and annual returns RSA ACADEMIES

Charity number: 1148908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 February 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 February 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window