Financial history RSA ACADEMIES

Charity number: 1148908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £282.61k £270.73k £275.70k £236.51k £60.60k
Total expenditure £223.36k £249.00k £292.59k £225.00k £175.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A