IMMIGRATION LAW PRACTITIONERS' ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1155286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £555.30k £568.41k £696.07k £745.17k £712.45k
Total expenditure £596.98k £629.38k £660.72k £662.03k £724.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £13.86k £15.00k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £40.03k £66.69k £50.00k £50.00k £0
Income - Other trading activities £21.74k £23.04k £19.25k £18.18k £15.50k
Income - Charitable activities £492.16k £477.24k £625.57k £675.73k £695.83k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.38k £1.44k £1.25k £1.26k £1.13k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £596.98k £629.38k £660.72k £662.03k £724.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £40.20k £31.86k £72.07k £55.17k £41.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £55.72k £104.15k £135.12k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0