Financial history NILKANTH ESTATES

Charity number: 1148431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.65m £11.68m £7.86m £1.42m £2.12m
Total expenditure £1.02m £2.27m £1.37m £1.45m £1.23m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.81m £10.71m £6.51m £67.15k £1.00m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £848.30k £973.65k £1.35m £1.29m £1.11m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £68.43k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £0 £1.24m £991.55k £0 £1.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £158.74k £196.71k £374.70k £393.32k £176.08k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £19.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £865.22k £834.69k £0 £1.05m £0