EMERGENCY-LIFE SUPPORT FOR CIVILIAN VICTIMS OF WAR AND POVERTY,UK

Charity number: 1148818
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 15 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 15 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 03 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 03 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 24 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 24 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 26 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 26 March 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2015 28 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2015 05 March 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)