WEYMOUTH CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1148603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £290.32k £280.77k £310.69k £340.78k £450.19k
Total expenditure £271.19k £265.37k £262.89k £316.75k £425.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £50.00k