WAT PHRA SINGH UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Buddhist Temple and Meditation Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £27,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 August 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Clive COLLACOTT | Chair | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Irvine | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Edward Skinner | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Varaporn Vaughan | Trustee | 28 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
KWANJIT COLLACOTT | Trustee | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHRAMAHA THIRASAK DUANGSIRI | Trustee | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.47k | £83.44k | £178.13k | £93.19k | £93.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.83k | £52.33k | £93.64k | £84.84k | £114.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £27.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 21 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24/08/2012 as amended on 20 Aug 2019 as amended on 24 Apr 2021 as amended on 26 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THERAVADA BUDDHISM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE NORTHWEST OF ENGLAND AND BEYOND, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A. ESTABLISHING A PERMANENT TEMPLE WHERE THE DHAMMA CAN BE STUDIED AND TAUGHT AND WHERE MEDITATION CAN BE PRACTICED; B. PROVIDING SUPPORT TO BUDDHIST MONKS AND NUNS IN THEIR STUDIES AND PASTORAL DUTIES; C. RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THERAVADA BUDDHISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wat Phra Singh UK
88 High Street
RUNCORN
WA7 1JH
- Phone:
- 01928575444
- Email:
- metta@watphrasinghuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window