THE KESTRELMAN TRUST

Charity number: 1150057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £68.69k £52.92k £47.16k £35.56k £23.53k
Total expenditure £506.26k £515.57k £477.22k £501.92k £570.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A