Accounts and annual returns THE HELEN RACHAEL MACKANESS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1151396
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 April 2022 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 09 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 15 February 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 02 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 08 February 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 08 February 2019 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window