MACCABI LONDON BRADY RECREATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1149701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £796.28k £811.31k £671.98k £751.33k £467.81k
Total expenditure £699.88k £675.49k £984.61k £567.75k £533.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £137.36k £212.75k £102.97k £278.37k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £264.42k £231.14k £232.41k £192.16k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £394.43k £367.38k £336.55k £280.80k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £73 £36 £46 £6 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £632.55k £625.61k £942.96k £522.37k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £67.33k £49.88k £41.65k £40.64k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £4.74k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £4.74k N/A