COMMUNITY EDUCATION EMPLOYMENT AND ADVICE LTD

Charity number: 1149568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 11 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 11 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 07 December 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 07 December 2020 7 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 25 February 2020 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 25 February 2020 87 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 03 October 2019 307 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required