COMMUNITY EDUCATION EMPLOYMENT AND ADVICE LTD

Charity number: 1149568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £20.25k £11.77k £31.26k £35.16k £50.73k
Total expenditure £21.85k £7.58k £34.04k £38.05k £54.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A