Financial history ASTRE ACADEMY OF GYMNASTICS LIMITED

Charity number: 1150345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £100.88k £97.10k £94.91k £135.25k £87.36k
Total expenditure £100.12k £101.82k £102.23k £92.88k £98.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.71k £92.43k £15.22k