Financial history THE BETTY MESSENGER CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £556.68k £309.83k £668.99k £726.66k £583.55k
Total expenditure £577.12k £376.27k £2.16m £2.64m £342.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies -£30.74k N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £587.43k N/A £668.99k £726.66k £583.55k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies -£30.74k N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £577.12k N/A £1.95m £2.34m £90.17k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £210.11k £298.31k £251.89k
Expenditure - Governance £18.85k N/A £47.45k £70.57k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £139.38k N/A £0 £2.27m £90.17k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £208.50k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0