THE VENTURE (WREXHAM) LIMITED

Charity number: 1153454

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jayne Alton Trustee 30 May 2019 None on record
Maarten William Kuiper Trustee 13 November 2013 None on record
NIGEL MILLS Trustee 23 October 2012 None on record
Paul Firth Trustee 11 July 2017 None on record
Janet Growcott Chair 01 May 2014 None on record
Evrah Rose Trustee 30 May 2019 None on record