THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEATHFIELD WITH COTFORD ST LUKE

Charity number: 1148869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 23 August 2016 On time Download