THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEATHFIELD WITH COTFORD ST LUKE

Charity number: 1148869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £33.12k £26.13k £94.80k £596.63k £69.43k
Total expenditure £23.24k £29.80k £95.06k £648.60k £61.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £660 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £212.81k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £4.77k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £44 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £379.00k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £648.60k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £1.64k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A