THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEATHFIELD WITH COTFORD ST LUKE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To celebrate God's love through worship in a variety of styles and settings for all ages. To care for and serve all people in our church, our community and the wider world. To grow spiritually through teaching, listening, prayer, fellowship and service. To make known the Good News of the love of God in Jesus. To provide a centre in the village of Cotford St Luke where everyone is welcomed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 06 September 2012: Previously excepted registration
- HEATHFIELD WITH COTFORD ST LUKE PCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Barclay Barrowman | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Alan Kirkham | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David BLELOCH | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Suzanne Kirkham | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Jane STIRZAKER | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline HAY-BERRY | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Christopher Turner | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Anthony Reyre | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Bleloch | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Harris | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare REID | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS DAWN MITFORD-SLADE | Trustee | 10 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.43k | £48.48k | £58.81k | £56.85k | £73.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.87k | £53.54k | £36.50k | £52.62k | £76.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.83k | £28.32k | £4.07k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Lukes Centre
Rogers Walk
Cotford St. Luke
TAUNTON
TA4 1HY
- Phone:
- 07788655895
- Email:
- treasurer.csl@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window