THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEATHFIELD WITH COTFORD ST LUKE

Charity number: 1148869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Elizabeth Durrant Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Clare REID Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
RODNEY TERYN LATHAM Trustee 17 April 2013 None on record
Rev Clarice Shaw-Notice Trustee 28 September 2020 None on record
Claire Bleloch Trustee 19 May 2021 None on record
Dr Philip Andrew Hall Trustee 19 May 2021 None on record
Susan Harris Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Roberta Winterson Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Gabrielle Jane Elliott Trustee 19 May 2021 None on record
David Rhodes Trustee 22 July 2020 None on record
MRS DAWN MITFORD-SLADE Trustee 10 August 2012 None on record