WOOLPIT FESTIVAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1149380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 21 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 21 September 2019 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 01 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 20 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required