EASTON COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £51,894 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 07 March 2013: Standard registration
- 27 January 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 January 2022: Funds transferred to 1081691 EASTSIDE COMMUNITY TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.01k | £148.34k | £130.54k | £156.61k | £240.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.96k | £147.34k | £146.54k | £149.50k | £189.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | £10.15k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £37.80k | £57.80k | N/A | N/A | £51.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 31 December 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 30 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 30 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 AUG 2009 INCORPORATED 07/08/2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: (1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE EASTON AREA OF BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOODS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. 2) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF THE EASTON AREA OF BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOODS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY 3) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE AGREED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION UNDER THE ARTICLES OF THE COMPANY, AND NOTIFIED TO, AND ACCEPTED BY THE CHARITY COMMISSION AS CHARITABLE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window