Financial history BLIND DOG RESCUE UK

Charity number: 1148828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £55.07k £91.17k £79.75k £59.54k £105.25k
Total expenditure £59.13k £80.91k £83.22k £61.94k £93.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A