PETERBOROUGH WINTER SPORTS CLUB

Charity number: 1149081
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.85m £3.55m £3.50m £3.73m £3.80m
Total expenditure £2.86m £3.56m £3.49m £3.73m £3.79m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £26.09k £18.90k £16.79k £4.76k £3
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.82m £3.54m £3.47m £3.71m £3.77m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £7.71k £15.21k £34.78k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.85m £3.56m £3.49m £3.73m £3.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.69k £19.57k £0 £29.83k £30.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0