Governing document SEARCH DOGS BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED ON 03 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED ON 19 JUL 2013 AS AMENDED ON 17 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED ON 02 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED ON 01 AUG 2017 AS AMENDED ON 22 FEB 2022 AS AMENDED ON 06 DEC 2022
Charitable objects
1. PROMOTING ADEQUATE K9 SEARCH AND RESCUE ARRANGEMENTS IN BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES IN CO-OPERATION WITH ITS MEMBERS, PARTNERS, GOVERNMENT BODIES AND OTHER RELEVANT ORGANISATIONS. 2. ENSURING APPROPRIATE CONSISTENT TRAINING STANDARDS AND USE OF BEST-PRACTICE BY MEMBERS IN LOWLAND SEARCH AND RESCUE TECHNIQUES. 3. PROMOTING APPROPRIATE STANDARDS AND CONDUCT AMONGST MEMBERS WITH THE AIM THAT LOCAL POLICE FORCES ACCEPT SEARCH DOGS BUCKINGHAMSHIRE MEMBERS AND LOWLAND RESCUE AS APPROPRIATE AND EFFECTIVE PARTNERS FOR SEARCH & RESCUE OPERATIONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.