Trustees SEARCH DOGS BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Charity number: 1149131
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Seaman | Chair | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Somerville | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Doris Heidi Totesaut | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Bates | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Anstey | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.