THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHAD, HANDFORTH

Charity number: 1149381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr John Barnes Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
Steve Burmester Chair 16 October 2012
THE BENEY TRUST Received: On time
David Raggett Trustee 07 October 2019 None on record
Carole Anne Harding Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
Avril Allen Trustee 25 October 2020 None on record
Pam Whitney Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
IAN BARRY PETTIGREW Trustee 16 October 2012 None on record
Jim Lethbridge Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
David Gilbert Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
CHRIS BIRCH Trustee 16 October 2012 None on record
Robert Moore Trustee 30 April 2017
JACOB'S WELL TRUST Received: On time
Susan Sanders Trustee 25 October 2020 None on record
Rachel McDowell Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Dalene Moore Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
Pat Grange Trustee 09 January 2018 None on record
Margi Lawrence Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record